Gibson et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gibson and Dewan Gibson
Defendant: TIAA Bank and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv11798
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 9/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 2, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman to District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (NAhm)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation, TIAA Bank from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 2020-006079-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7901834 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Sheriff's Deed) (Ramin, Nasseem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gibson
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewan Gibson
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA Bank
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?