Alashwal v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Taher Mohamed Ali Alashwal
Defendant: Secretary of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Attorney General of the United States and Assistant Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2020cv11837
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Response due by 10/12/2020 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Anchill on behalf of All Defendants. (Anchill, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Secretary of State served on 08/21/2020. (Atie, Remond)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Atie, Remond)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SKra)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Secretary of State* (SKra)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Bureau of Investigation* (SKra)
July 9, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Atie, Remond)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SKra)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Secretary of State* (SKra)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Bureau of Investigation* (SKra)
July 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Taher Mohamed Ali Alashwal. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Atie, Remond)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Remond A. Atie re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by All Defendants against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7910495 - Fee: 400 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Washington. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Atie, Remond)[FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS] Modified on 7/8/2020 (DPer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alashwal v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State
Represented By: Remond A. Atie
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Remond A. Atie
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Remond A. Atie
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Attorney General
Represented By: Remond A. Atie
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taher Mohamed Ali Alashwal
Represented By: Remond A. Atie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?