Pistorio et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Paul Murdock and Edward Pistorio
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11838
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Filing of Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas J. Murray appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Murray, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandi L. Burke appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Burke, Brandi)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody R. Padgett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Padgett, Cody)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek H. Zohdy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zohdy, Tarek)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Weinmann on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Weinmann, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha K. Monesi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Monesi, Trisha)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kalas, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Hughes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hughes, Emily)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (DPer)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Paul Murdock, Edward Pistorio. (Almonrode, Sharon)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Edward Pistorio, Paul Murdock against FCA US LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7910536 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-FCA US, Customers Drive Development of Uconnect Touch, #3 Exhibit 2-FCA US, All-new 2017 Chrysler Pacifica Offers Latest, Innovative Uconnect Systems and Services, #4 Exhibit 3-FCA US, Chrysler Group Announces Name of In-Vehicle Communications System, #5 Exhibit 4-FCA US, Innovative Technologies Available on the 2005 Chrysler 300, #6 Exhibit 5-FCA US, Chrysler LLC Launces Umbrella uconnect Name for Connectivity Technologies, #7 Exhibit 6-FCA US, Chrysler Group LLC Debuts New Uconnect Mobile Exhibit at 2012 International Consumer electronics Show, #8 Exhibit 7-FCA US, New Uconnect Access Has Power to Please, With Ease, #9 Exhibit 8-New Chrysler 300 Offers Latest, Innovative Uconnect Systems and Services, #10 Exhibit 9-Uconnect for Chrysler Pacifica, 300 & Voyager, #11 Exhibit 10-FCA US, FCAs All-new Uconnect 5 Global Platform Is the Most Advanced Uconnect System Ever: Powerful, Personalized, Connected and Easy to Use, #12 Exhibit 11-NHTSA, Driver Assistance Technologies, #13 Exhibit 12-Akweli Parker, How Car Testing Works) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pistorio et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Murdock
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Pistorio
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Brandi L. Burke
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?