DDLI Logistics LLC v. Metalsa SA de CV et al
Plaintiff: DDLI Logistics LLC a limited liability company Doing business as American Rail Center Logistics
Defendant: Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated and Metalsa SA de CV
Case Number: 2:2020cv11872
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mutual Confidentiality and Non-Use Agreement) (Danek, Brad)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying as Moot the #10 Motion to Dismiss. An #12 Amended Complaint was filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by DDLI Logistics LLC. (Wagoner, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by DDLI Logistics LLC against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement) (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated (Sharkey, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mutual Confidentiality and Non-Use Agreement) (Danek, Brad)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Danek on behalf of Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated. (Danek, Brad)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel N. Sharkey on behalf of Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated. (Sharkey, Daniel)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by DDLI Logistics LLC re #4 Order to Show Cause, #1 Complaint,, (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response to the #4 Order to Show Cause is due by 7/27/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Show Cause by DDLI Logistics LLC. (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DDLI Logistics LLC (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 7/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated* (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Metalsa SA de CV* (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7915808 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement) (Wagoner, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDLI Logistics LLC v. Metalsa SA de CV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalsa Structural Products, Incorporated
Represented By: Brad A. Danek
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalsa SA de CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDLI Logistics LLC a limited liability company Doing business as American Rail Center Logistics
Represented By: Gregory H. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?