Bormuth v. City of Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Peter Bormuth
Defendant: Arlene Robinson, in her official capacity as City Council member, Laura Schlecte, in her official capacity as City Council member, City of Jackson and Derek Dobies, in his official capacity as Mayor
Case Number: 2:2020cv11923
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order Remanding Case, #10 Order Rescinding Reference on Peter Bormuth at 142 W. Pearl Street, Jackson, MI 49201. (EKar)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE remanding case to JACKSON COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE to Jackson County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (DPer)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Rescinding Reference to United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Defendants #6 Response to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Peter Bormuth. (JOwe)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Forbush, Audrey)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT A re #5 MOTION to Remand by Peter Bormuth (JOwe)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Forbush, Audrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Peter Bormuth. (ATee)
July 20, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Text-Only Order on Peter Bormuth at 142 W. Pearl Street, Jackson, MI 49201. (MWil)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT) by All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey J. Forbush on behalf of All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey)
July 20, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), please submit a joint discovery plan no later than August 10, 2020. (MWil)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
July 16, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 20-1393-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7929573 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Forbush, Audrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bormuth v. City of Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Robinson, in her official capacity as City Council member
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Schlecte, in her official capacity as City Council member
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jackson
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Dobies, in his official capacity as Mayor
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bormuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?