Tollbrook West LLC v. City of Troy
Plaintiff: Tollbrook West LLC
Defendant: City of Troy
Case Number: 2:2020cv11939
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Tollbrook West LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Helvey v. Helvey, #3 Exhibit B - Tollbrook West, LLC's Complaint) (Carson, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by City of Troy. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Tollbrook West Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Tollbrook Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 Tollbrook Complaint dated May 2017, #5 Exhibit 4 Opinion and Order January 2018, #6 Exhibit 5 Opinion Sixth Circuirt Court of Appeals May 2019, #7 Exhibit 6 Troy's Zoning Ordinance relevant portions, #8 Exhibit 7 Complaint Dated January 7, 2020, #9 Exhibit 8 Opinion and Order Oakland County Circuit Court, #10 Exhibit 9 Tollbrook West Brief on Appeal, #11 Exhibit 10 Minutes of Troy City Council and ZBA, #12 Exhibit 11 Map of location) (Dufrane, Julie)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant City of Troy to File a Response and Brief in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( Response due by 8/31/2020). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (NAhm)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Schlackman on behalf of Tollbrook West LLC. (Schlackman, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Tollbrook West LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Carson, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Troy. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Troy Zoning Ordinance, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint dated January 7 2020, #4 Exhibit C - Opinion and Order Dismissing January 7 2020 Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Michigan Zoning Enabling Act, #6 Exhibit E - Troy City Council Minutes July 22 2019, #7 Exhibit F - Troy ZBA Minutes November 19 2019) (Dufrane, Julie)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori G. Bluhm on behalf of All Defendants. (Bluhm, Lori)
July 20, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Q. Dufrane on behalf of City of Troy. (Dufrane, Julie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Troy from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-181895-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7933559 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: Oakland County Circuit Court, 2020-178896/99-AA, Judge Jeffrey Matis] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court, 20-11938, Judge Linda Parker] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Dufrane, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tollbrook West LLC v. City of Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tollbrook West LLC
Represented By: David E. Schlackman
Represented By: Robert M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Troy
Represented By: Julie Q. Dufrane
Represented By: Lori G. Bluhm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?