Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern v. G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern
Plaintiff: Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern
Defendant: G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern
Case Number: 2:2020cv11952
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern. (Tomkiw, Andrey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern against Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern by G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern. (Weintraub, Arnold)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,, by Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern (Tomkiw, Andrey)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #1 , ( Response due by 8/28/2020). Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Arnold S. Weintraub appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Weintraub, Arnold)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,, by Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern (Tomkiw, Andrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern* (DWor)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern against G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7936863 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Correspondences, #2 Exhibit 2- Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3- Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4- Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5- Buisness Name Reservation) (Tomkiw, Andrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern v. G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G& J American Grill Inc, d/b/a 5th Tavern
Represented By: Arnold S. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Detroit Burger Bar of Clarkston, LLC d/b/a 15th Street Tavern
Represented By: Andrey T. Tomkiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?