Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC et al
Plaintiff: LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Defendant: Computerised Joint Surgery PLC, Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Motown Injury, P.C., Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C., Radiology Group LLC, Adam Rodnick, D.C., Joseph Lupo, D.C., Sam Hakki, M.D., Future Diagnostic Center LLC, Mona Thamer, A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C., Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC and Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11957
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 30 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Future Diagnostic Center LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
September 3, 2020 Filing 29 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
September 3, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Future Diagnostic Center LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Future Diagnostic Center LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT: Response due by 10/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Adam Rodnick, D.C. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sam Hakki, M.D. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Radiology Group LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Motown Injury, P.C. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mona Thamer served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joseph Lupo, D.C. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Future Diagnostic Center LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Computerised Joint Surgery PLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Computerised Joint Surgery PLC, Sam Hakki, M.D., Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC, Radiology Group LLC, Mona Thamer. (Joelson, Peter)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Warren on behalf of Computerised Joint Surgery PLC, Sam Hakki, M.D., Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC, Radiology Group LLC, Mona Thamer. (Warren, Emily)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C., Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C., Joseph Lupo, D.C., Motown Injury, P.C., Adam Rodnick, D.C. (Blumberg, Gary)
July 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C., Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Computerised Joint Surgery PLC, Future Diagnostic Center LLC, Sam Hakki, M.D., Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C., Joseph Lupo, D.C., Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC, Motown Injury, P.C., Radiology Group LLC, Adam Rodnick, D.C., Mona Thamer* (SKra)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LM Insurance Corporation (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LM General Insurance Company (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. DeNinno on behalf of LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (DeNinno, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Tilden, Nathan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn McEttrick on behalf of LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois against A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C., Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Computerised Joint Surgery PLC, Future Diagnostic Center LLC, Sam Hakki, M.D., Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C., Joseph Lupo, D.C., Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC, Motown Injury, P.C., Radiology Group LLC, Adam Rodnick, D.C., Mona Thamer with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7938674 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Suffolk County, MA - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mini Invasive Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #3 Exhibit 2 - Computerized Joint Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #4 Exhibit 3 - Michigan Musculoskeletal Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #5 Exhibit 4 - Advanced Central Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #6 Exhibit 5 - Future Diagnostic Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #7 Exhibit 6 - Motown Injury Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rodnick Chiropractic Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #9 Exhibit 8 - Lupo Chiropractic Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #10 Exhibit 9 - Radiology Group Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #11 Exhibit 10 - Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs June 21, 2018 Administrative Complaint Against Hakki, #12 Exhibit 11 - October 2, 2018 LARA Memorandum Regarding Hakki, #13 Exhibit 12 - Bay Pines Department of Veterans Affairs Healthcare Systems in Bay Pines, Florida December 5, 2017 Letter Regarding Hakki, #14 Exhibit 13 - August 29, 2018 LARA Investigation Expert Review, #15 Exhibit 14 - Hakki Michigan Surgical Hospital Profile, #16 Exhibit 15 - Hakki Bay Pines VAs Professional Comprehensive Review Panel Testimony, #17 Exhibit 16 - LARA search of USFs directory, #18 Exhibit 17 - Patient Y.A.s (Claim No. 033378468) Bills and Records, #19 Exhibit 18 - Patient B.W.s (Claim No. 032900170) Bills and Records, #20 Exhibit 19 - Patient P.M.s (Claim No. 170323726039) Bills and Records, #21 Exhibit 20 - Patient R.A.s (Claim No. 033555253) Bills and Records, #22 Exhibit 21 - Mail and Wire Fraud Chart, #23 Exhibit 22 - Mini Invasive Damages Chart, #24 Exhibit 23 - Computerized Joint Damages Chart, #25 Exhibit 24 - Michigan Musculoskeletal Damages Chart, #26 Exhibit 25 - Advanced Central Damages Chart, #27 Exhibit 26 - Future Diagnostic Damages Chart, #28 Exhibit 27 - Motown Injury Damages Chart, #29 Exhibit 28 - Rodnick Chiropractic Damages Chart, #30 Exhibit 29 - Lupo Chiropractic Damages Chart, #31 Exhibit 30 - Radiology Group Damages Chart, #32 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #33 Proposed Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computerised Joint Surgery PLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motown Injury, P.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupo Chiropractic Life Center, P.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Group LLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rodnick, D.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lupo, D.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hakki, M.D.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Diagnostic Center LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Thamer
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Rodnick Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Musculoskeletal Institute PLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mini Invasive Orthopedics PLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?