Evans v. Rosso et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Evans
Defendant: Andrew Ngo, Zachary Rosso and Triple Canopy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11959
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after March 19, 2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 3/19/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/3/2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou)
September 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Henzi, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Reset Conference ***TIME CHANGE ONLY***: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/3/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
August 6, 2020 Reset Conference ***TIME CHANGE ONLY***: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Triple Canopy, Inc. (Henzi, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon McNeal on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McNeal, Brandon)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Henzi, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 [ENTERED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *Triple Canopy, Inc.* (LGra) Modified on 7/22/2020 (LGra).
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 [ENTERED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *Zachary Rosso* (LGra) Modified on 7/22/2020 (LGra).
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 [ENTERED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *Andrew Ngo* (LGra) Modified on 7/22/2020 (LGra).
July 22, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas E. Kuhn appearing on behalf of Carmen Evans (Kuhn, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew Ngo, Triple Canopy, Inc., Zachary Rosso from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-006579-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7938900 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - June 22, 2020 Correspondence) (Henzi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Rosso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Ngo
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Rosso
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Canopy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Evans
Represented By: Thomas E. Kuhn
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Represented By: Brandon McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?