Boon v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jaynee Boon
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Innovis Data Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 2:2020cv11971
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Certain Affirmative Defenses raised by Trans Union, LLC by All Plaintiffs (Bolos, Sylvia)
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany D. Parling on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Parling, Brittany)
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION to extend Plaintiff's Rule 12(f) Deadline in relation to Trans Union, LLC's Pleadings by All Plaintiffs (Bolos, Sylvia)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Short statements or Rule 26(f) report due by 10/5/2020. (SPin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. Number will be provided 10/7/2020. (SPin)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 10/2/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 9/23/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Second) by Nelnet Servicing, LLC (Jerabek, Marc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Extend Innovis's Responsive Pleading Deadline to 9/23/2020 by Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. (Spak, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nelnet Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Jerabek, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading due by 9/9/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (MacKay, K)
August 17, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Nelnet Servicing, LLC (Jerabek, Marc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc P. Jerabek appearing on behalf of Nelnet Servicing, LLC (Jerabek, Marc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Extending Deadline to File Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading due by 9/9/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (MacKay, K)
August 11, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (Bolton, Jordan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Bolton on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Slater McDonald on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (McDonald, Esther)
August 7, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
August 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Policchio on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Brady, Scott)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Extending Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint. Responsive pleadings due by 9/9/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (MacKay, K)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Department of Education served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Experian Information Solutions, Inc to File Responsive Pleadings by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fraser, Tamara)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION to extend Innovis's time to file Responsive Pleadings by All Plaintiffs (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney L. Frank on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Frank, Sidney)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fraser, Tamara)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara E. Fraser on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fraser, Tamara)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Spak on behalf of Innovis Data Solutions, Inc.. (Spak, Jason)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nelnet Servicing, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trans Union, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service) (Bolos, Sylvia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian B. Lyngklip on behalf of Jaynee Boon. (Lyngklip, Ian)
July 23, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7942771 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- NelNet Demand Letter) (Bolos, Sylvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boon v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney L. Frank
Represented By: Tamara E. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Spak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Esther Slater McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Marc P. Jerabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Brittany D. Parling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaynee Boon
Represented By: Sylvia Bolos
Represented By: Ian Bryce Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?