LinTech Global, Inc. v. Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: LinTech Global, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv12062
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 RESET CONFERENCE ***TIME CHANGE ONLY***: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Federal Aviation Administration. (Toomey, Zak)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman to District Judge Linda V. Parker. (NAhm)
July 31, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Aviation Administration* (DWor)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Steiner on behalf of LinTech Global, Inc.. (Steiner, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LinTech Global, Inc. (Boutrous, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LinTech Global, Inc. against Federal Aviation Administration. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7961280 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cv-11600, Judge Linda V. Parker] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Subpoena to FAA, #3 Exhibit 2. FAA letter dated 2/28/20, #4 Exhibit 3. FAA letter dated 3/19/20, #5 Exhibit 4. Letter to FAA dated 4/7/20, #6 Exhibit 5. FAA letter dated 4/24/20, #7 Exhibit 6. Emails correspondence with the FAA, #8 Exhibit 7. Letter from FAA dated 5/13/20, #9 Exhibit 8. Letter from FAA dated 7/20/20, #10 Exhibit 9. Deposition subpoenas) (Boutrous, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LinTech Global, Inc. v. Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LinTech Global, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Boutrous, II
Represented By: Mark William Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?