Jobs for Downriver et al v. Michigan, State of - Governor et al
Plaintiff: Jobs for Downriver, Progress for Saline, Jobs for Oakland, Jobs for Plymouth and Jobs for Harper Woods
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, City of Flat Rock, City of Plymouth, City of Wixom, City of Harper Woods, Maureen Brodie Plymouth City Clerk, City of Auburn HIlls, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk, Director Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Terri Royal Saline City Clerk, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk, City of Saline, Laura Pierce Auburn Hills City Clerk, Meaghan Bachman Flat Rock City Clerk and Michigan, State of - Governor
Case Number: 2:2020cv12115
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Mains, Douglas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Mains, Douglas)
August 25, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 8/31/2020 is Cancelled. Case dismissed with prejudice per #34 Stipulation of Dismissal. (BSau)
August 24, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mains, Douglas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Plymouth, Maureen Brodie Plymouth City Clerk. (Seibert, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #29 Supplemental Brief, filed by Michigan, State of - Governor, Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State by City of Wixom, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk (McLaughlin, Anne)
August 20, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #25 Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. Detroit Unity - Order Denying TRO) (Meingast, Heather)
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 EXHIBIT B re #23 Response to Motion,, by City of Harper Woods, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Affidavit of Leslie Frank) (Petrusak, Nathan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (corrected copy of #26 ) filed by City of Wixom, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk. (McLaughlin, Anne)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Motion filed by Michigan, State of - Governor, Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State. Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 17, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Wixom, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (McLaughlin, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor. (Meingast, Heather)
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Motion by Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor. (Meingast, Heather)
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Harper Woods, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Jobs for HW Statement of Organization, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Leslie Frank, #4 Exhibit C Harper Woods Code of Ordinances, #5 Exhibit D Clean Green Utica Statement of Organization, #6 Exhibit E Clean Green Utica Petitions, #7 Exhibit F Kishore v Whitmer, #8 Exhibit G Esshaki v Whitmer, #9 Exhibit H Reclaim Idaho v Little, #10 Exhibit I Little v Reclaim Idaho) (Petrusak, Nathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Laura Pierce Auburn Hills City Clerk, City of Auburn HIlls. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit) (Roberts, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Plymouth. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Seibert, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction Defs City of Flat Rock and Meaghan Bachman filed by City of Flat Rock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6) (Landry, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Saline, Terri Royal Saline City Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Terri Royal, City Clerk for the City of Saline, #3 Exhibit B - Statement of Organization form) (Shekell, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon A. DeWaele appearing on behalf of City of Harper Woods, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk (DeWaele, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Seibert on behalf of Maureen Brodie Plymouth City Clerk. (Seibert, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Seibert on behalf of City of Plymouth. (Seibert, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Landry on behalf of City of Flat Rock. (Landry, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nathan D. Petrusak appearing on behalf of City of Harper Woods, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk (Petrusak, Nathan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne McClorey McLaughlin on behalf of City of Wixom, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk. (McLaughlin, Anne)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian C. Grant appearing on behalf of City of Harper Woods, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk (Grant, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark S. Roberts appearing on behalf of Laura Pierce Auburn Hills City Clerk, City of Auburn HIlls (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Roberts, Mark)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor (Grill, Erik)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor (Meingast, Heather)
August 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Trebilcock on behalf of City of Saline, Terri Royal Saline City Clerk. (Trebilcock, Christopher)
August 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Shekell on behalf of City of Saline, Terri Royal Saline City Clerk. (Shekell, Brian)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 8/17/2020, Reply due by 8/24/2020, Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://zoom.us/j/98753859094?pwd=OVQ0VDZxNGlyLzNtcXNadjlpdmZ6Zz09 Passcode: 346192 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98753859094#,,,,,,0#,,346192# or +13017158592,,98753859094#,,,,,,0#,,346192#|. (BSau)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Mains on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mains, Douglas)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Blair, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Blair, Kevin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Laura Pierce Auburn Hills City Clerk, City of Auburn HIlls, City of Flat Rock, City of Harper Woods, City of Plymouth, City of Saline, City of Wixom, Meaghan Bachman Flat Rock City Clerk, Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk, Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections, Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State, Michigan, State of - Governor, Maureen Brodie Plymouth City Clerk, Terri Royal Saline City Clerk, Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk* (SKra)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7970796 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Blair, Kevin)
August 5, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jobs for Downriver et al v. Michigan, State of - Governor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson Michigan Secretary of State
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Flat Rock
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Plymouth
Represented By: Robert J. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wixom
Represented By: Anne McClorey McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Harper Woods
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Sharon A. DeWaele
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Brodie Plymouth City Clerk
Represented By: Robert J. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Auburn HIlls
Represented By: Mark S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Frank Harper Woods City Clerk
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Sharon A. DeWaele
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Jonathan Brater Michigan Bureau of Elections
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Royal Saline City Clerk
Represented By: Christopher M. Trebilcock
Represented By: Brian Shekell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Buck Wixom City Clerk
Represented By: Anne McClorey McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Saline
Represented By: Christopher M. Trebilcock
Represented By: Brian Shekell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pierce Auburn Hills City Clerk
Represented By: Mark S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meaghan Bachman Flat Rock City Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of - Governor
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobs for Downriver
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Represented By: Douglas E. Mains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progress for Saline
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Represented By: Douglas E. Mains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobs for Oakland
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Represented By: Douglas E. Mains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobs for Plymouth
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Represented By: Douglas E. Mains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobs for Harper Woods
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Represented By: Douglas E. Mains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?