Jordan, Jr. v. Stroughter et al
Plaintiff: Venias Jordan, Jr.
Defendant: Iranetta Wright, Mark White, Verynda Stroughter, Nikolai Vitti and Detroit Public Schools Community District
Case Number: 2:2020cv12126
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant Mark White's #11 Emergency MOTION to Seal File Pending the Filing and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Stroughter's, DPSCD, Vitti's, and Wright's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1),(6) filed by Venias Jordan, Jr.. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Venias Jordan, Jr. against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Seal Motion for 12(b)(6) in Lieu of an Answer by Mark White. (Perkins, Todd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Russell Perkins on behalf of Mark White. (Perkins, Todd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Protective Order by Mark White. (Perkins, Todd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Detroit Public Schools Community District. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Hurks-Hill, Phyllis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Iranetta Wright served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Verynda Stroughter served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nikolai Vitti served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Public Schools Community District served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm)
August 10, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit Public Schools Community District, Verynda Stroughter, Nikolai Vitti, Mark White, Iranetta Wright* (SKra)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Venias Jordan, Jr. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7975991 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 18-cv-13024, Judge Gershwin Drain] (Paterson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan, Jr. v. Stroughter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranetta Wright
Represented By: Phyllis L. Hurks-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark White
Represented By: Todd Russell Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verynda Stroughter
Represented By: Phyllis L. Hurks-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolai Vitti
Represented By: Phyllis L. Hurks-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Public Schools Community District
Represented By: Phyllis L. Hurks-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venias Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?