Davis et al v. Wayne County Board of Canvassers
Plaintiff: Venias Jordan, Jr., Leigh Reed-Pratt, Robert Davis and Shane Anders
Defendant: Wayne County Board of Canvassers
Petitioner: Kym Worthy
Case Number: 2:2020cv12127
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying #36 and #37 Motions for Sanctions; granting #45 Motion to Intervene; granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; finding as moot #15 Motion to Intervene - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE to #55 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 55) filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief In Support BOARD OF CANVASSERS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Davis v Johnson, #2 Exhibit BOC Manual 2020) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (REPLY MAY NOT EXCEED 13 PAGES) re #55 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF THAT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMITS by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief In Support filed by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying #57 EMERGENCY Amended MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #55 . Set Motion Deadlines as to #55 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint: (Response due by 10/16/2020) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #45 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Accept for Filing Plaintiffs' Response in opposition to Proposed Intervening Defendant Worthy's Amended Motion to Intervene by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to #45 Amended MOTION to Intervene filed by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to #57 Amended MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #55 BOARD OF CANVASSERS ANSWER TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING, SCHEDULING AND ADJUDICATION OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Amended MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #55 by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint #55 by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #54 Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Response due by 10/7/2020 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief In Support by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE by Shane Anders, Robert Davis re #34 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX of Amended Complaint Only (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Signed and Notarized Affidavit of Dearborn City Clerk George Darany, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Signed and Notarized Affidavit of Dearborn Deputy City Clerk Tracey Boudreau, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Signed and Filed Chief Judge Tim Kenny's Stipulated Order of Dismissal) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Shane Anders of withdrawal of #25 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Paterson, Andrew)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Shane Anders, Robert Davis re #34 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX of Amended Complaint Only (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Signed and Notarized Affidavit of Dearborn City Clerk George Darany, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Signed and Notarized Affidavit of Dearborn Deputy City Clerk Tracey Boudreau) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE to #37 Amended MOTION for Sanctions against Proposed Intervening Defendant Kym Worthy and Her Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC 1927 and The Court's Inherent Authority for Filing Frivolous Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 15) filed by Kym Worthy. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Email Regarding Sanctions, #3 Exhibit 2-Prosecutor Worthys Amended Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit 3- In Re Shane Anders Opinion) (Baldwin, Angela)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE to #34 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX of Amended Complaint Only WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF 34) filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE to #25 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF 25) filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index &Minutes of Board Meeting on September 2, 2020, #2 Exhibit Minutes of Board Meeting on September 4, 2020, #3 Exhibit Mich Const art 7 3 (1835), #4 Exhibit Mich Const art 10 3 (1850), #5 Exhibit Mich Const art 10 3 (1908), #6 Exhibit Anders v WCBOC - 20-011702-AW, #7 Exhibit In re Anders Petition, #8 Exhibit In re Anders Order) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE by Shane Anders, Robert Davis re #46 Order on Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' State-Court Complaint against Dearborn City Clerk, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Wayne County Circuit Court Chief Judge Tim Kenny's September 22, 2020 Order To Show Cause) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying #42 Emergency Motion to Stay - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #43 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order Staying The Destruction Of Absentee Ballots Cast and Used (Docket No. 42) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Amended MOTION to Intervene by Kym Worthy. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Order In Re: Shane Anders- Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals, #3 Exhibit 2-August 7, 2020 Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit 3-Prosecutor Kym L. Worthys Motion to Intervene, #5 Exhibit 4-September 4, 2020 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit 5-Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Proposed Intervenor Kym Worthys Motion to Intervene, #7 Exhibit 6-Plaintiffs Second Emergency Motion for Extension of Time) (Baldwin, Angela)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to #42 Emergency MOTION to Stay The Destruction of Absentee Ballots Cast and Used In AV Precinct #23 in the City of Dearborn in the August 4, 2020 primary election Pursuant to Mich. Comp. Laws 168.811, #43 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order Staying The Destruction Of Absentee Ballots Cast and Used (Docket No. 42) WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE DESTRUCTION OF ABSENTEE BALLOTS CAST AND USED IN AV VOTING PRECINCT #23 IN THE CITY OF DEARBORN PURSUANT TO MICH COMP LAWS 168.811 (ECF 42) AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE (ECF 43) filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Memorandum) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order Staying The Destruction Of Absentee Ballots Cast and Used (Docket No. 42) by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Wayne County Board of Canvassers Certification of Anders' Recount) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Emergency MOTION to Stay The Destruction of Absentee Ballots Cast and Used In AV Precinct #23 in the City of Dearborn in the August 4, 2020 primary election Pursuant to Mich. Comp. Laws 168.811 by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Wayne County Board of Canvassers Certification of Anders' Recount) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying #35 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX Only of Amended Complaint. Decision needed by Monday, September 21, 2020 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #33 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #15 MOTION to Intervene - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #34 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX of Amended Complaint Only (LBar)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit [Appeal Case Number 20-1880] (TTho)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE to #35 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX Only of Amended Complaint. Decision needed by Monday, September 21, 2020 WAYNE COUNTYS ANSWER TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING, SCHEDULING AND ADJUDICATION OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF 35) filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Amended MOTION for Sanctions against Proposed Intervening Defendant Kym Worthy and Her Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC 1927 and The Court's Inherent Authority for Filing Frivolous Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 15) by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Proposed Intervening Defendant Kym Worthy and Her Counsel for Filing Frivolous Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 15) by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying #35 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX Only of Amended Complaint. Decision needed by Monday, September 21, 2020 by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect to Count IX of Amended Complaint Only by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Wayne County Board of Canvassers' September 4, 2020 Certification of Anders' Recount) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support filed by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #28 MOTION to Strike #18 MOTION to Dismiss (LBar)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (LBar)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief In Support by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Strike #18 MOTION to Dismiss WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #25 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, for Preliminary Injunction (LBar)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff Anders' Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for TRO is 30 pages. by Shane Anders. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Shane Anders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of September 9, 2020 Meeting of the Wayne County Election Commission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plainitff Shane Anders' Declaration of Intent to Be Write In Candidate for Republican Primay for Wayne County Prosecutor, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Plaintiff Anders' Sworn Petition Requesting Recount of Votes Cast In Precincts Republican Primary, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Defendant Wayne County Board of Canvassers' Initial Tally of Write In Votes Counted for Plaintiff Anders, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D- September 2, 2020 Letter from Defendant Wayne County Board of Canvassers Informing Plaintiff Anders of the date and time of his recount) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support by Shane Anders, Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiff Shane Anders' Soon-to-be filed Emergency Ex parte Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction. Decision needed by 2 p.m. on Wednesday, September 9, 2020. by Shane Anders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Wayne County Board of Canvassers' Election DayTally of Write-In Votes Cast for Plaintiff Shane Anders, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Plaintiff Anders' sworn petition requesting recount of certain votes cast in August 4, 2020 Republican Primary Election, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- September 2, 2020 Letter from Wayne County Board of Canvassers Notifying Anders of Date of Recount) (Paterson, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF THAT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMITS by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #15 Motion to Intervene - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying #23 Motion to Expedite Briefing - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #22 Motion for Leave to Response Brief in Excess Pages. Response Brief to #18 Motion to Dismiss not to Exceed 30 Pages - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Added New Plaintiff Shane Anders and Removed Former Plaintiffs Venias Jordan, Jr. and Leigh Reed-Pratt and added additional federal claims against Defendant and added two new state-law claims against Defendant Wayne County Board of Canvassers filed by All Plaintiffs against Wayne County Board of Canvassers. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Paterson, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #15 MOTION to Intervene (LBar)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #18 MOTION to Dismiss WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS (LBar)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index & Ex 1-Hill v Winfrey complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2-Hill v Winfrey order, #3 Exhibit Ex 3-Davis v Benson order and Registers of Action) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction With Respect to Counts I and II . (Paterson, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction With Respect to Counts I and II WAYNE COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS I AND II ONLY filed by Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kym Worthy Affidavit of Identity, #2 Exhibit Burton-Harris Challenge to Kym Worthy Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Kym Worthy Response To Challenge, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Election Commission meeting, #5 Exhibit Certified Candidate List, #6 Exhibit Burton-Harris Complaint, #7 Exhibit Burton-Harris Order to Show Cause, #8 Exhibit Burton-Harris Court of Appeals Order dated June 9, 2020, #9 Exhibit Burton-Harris Orders dated June 15, 2020, #10 Exhibit Burton-Harris Court of Appeals Orders dated July 1, 2020, #11 Exhibit Burton-Harris Bypass Application for Leave dated July 6, 2020, #12 Exhibit Burton-Harris Bypass Supreme Court Order dated July 15, 2020, #13 Exhibit Brenda Jones Affidavit of Identity, #14 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Complaint, #15 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Motion, #16 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Motion For TRO, #17 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Order, #18 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Application For Leave, #19 Exhibit Davis v WCEC COA Order dated July 22, 2020, #20 Exhibit Davis v WCEC Circuit Court Order dated July 23, 2020, #21 Exhibit Davis v WCEC COA Emergency Appeal dated July 24, 2020, #22 Exhibit Board of Canvassers Certification, #23 Exhibit Davis v Benson Order and Registers of Action) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support by Kym Worthy. (Baldwin, Angela)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Baldwin on behalf of Kym Worthy. (Baldwin, Angela)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin B. Hollowell on behalf of Kym Worthy. (Hollowell, Melvin)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Motion Deadlines/Hearings as to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Respect to Counts I and II: (Response due by 8/31/2020, Reply due by 9/9/2020, Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2020 @ 2:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #7 AMENDED Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood to District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (NAhm)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Anderson-Davis on behalf of Wayne County Board of Canvassers. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne County Board of Canvassers served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Leigh Reed-Pratt re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction With Respect to Counts I and II, #1 Complaint,, by Leigh Reed-Pratt (Paterson, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for TRO/Preliminary Has Been Edited and Revised to 26 Pages, which is just 1 page over teh 25-page limit. See Docket No. 6. by All Plaintiffs. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction With Respect to Counts I and II by All Plaintiffs. (Paterson, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Davis re #1 Complaint,, and in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO, or in the alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Wayne County Board of Canvassers* (SKra)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction in Excess of 25-Page Limit by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support) (Paterson, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INDEX of Exhibits re #1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Kym Worthy's Affidavit of Identity, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Shane Anders' Declaration of Intent to Be Write-In Candidate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Victoria Burton-Harris' Legal Challenge, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- June 5, 2020 Determination Issued by Wayne County Clerk re Certification of Kym Worthy, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Wayne County Circuit Court's Local Administrative Order 2017-08, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-Wayne County Circuit Court Chief Judge Tim Kenny's June 15, 2020 Order in Victoria Burton-Harris' state-court case, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Michigan Supreme Court's July 15, 2020 Denying Plaintiff Davis' Application for Leave to Appeal and Bypass, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H- Brenda Jones' Affidavit of Identity, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I- Plaintiff Robert Davis' May 30, 2020 Email to Gil Flowers and Gil Flowers' June 2, 2020 Response Email, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J- Plaintiff Robert Davis June 1, 2020 Email to Gil Flowers and Gil Flowers' June 3, 2020 Response Email) (Paterson, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Wayne County Board of Canvassers with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7976219 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 20-cv-11991, Judge Matthew Leitman] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Paterson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Wayne County Board of Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venias Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Reed-Pratt
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Anders
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Board of Canvassers
Represented By: Janet Anderson-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kym Worthy
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Angela L. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?