Milman v. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Polina Milman
Defendant: Fieger & Fieger, P.C., Geoffrey Fieger and Fieger, Fieger Kenney & Harrington, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12154
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Polina Milman against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geoffrey Fieger served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Ex Parte #6 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Alternate Service by Polina Milman. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Copy of LARA report, #3 Exhibit B - Aaron Marlow's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Lynne Sheridan's Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - USPS tracking - home, #6 Exhibit E - USPS tracking - office, #7 Exhibit F - Email to S. Teal, #8 Exhibit G - Detroit Free Press Article) (Gordon, Deborah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of Polina Milman. (Thomas, Sarah)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of Polina Milman. (Taylor, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Fieger & Fieger, P.C.* (DWor)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Geoffrey Fieger* (DWor)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7981645 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milman v. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieger & Fieger, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Fieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieger, Fieger Kenney & Harrington, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polina Milman
Represented By: Deborah L. Gordon
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor
Represented By: Sarah Gordon Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?