Spearman v. Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Spearman
Defendant: Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12183
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2020 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (Joint Rule 26f Report Due 10/19/2020) (LSau)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.. (Hall, Cyril)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Taub, Adam)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.* (DWor)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Spearman against Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7986158 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spearman v. Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spearman
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Runner Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?