Malik v. Landstar Express American Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nazamud Din Malik
Defendant: Landstar Express American Inc and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv12229
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/9/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EKar)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter C. Christopher on behalf of Nazamud Din Malik. (Christopher, Hunter)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles David Miller, II on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Miller, Charles)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: Charles David Miller, II added. (Miller, Charles)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Landstar Express American Inc from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-001446-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7994906 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Duenas, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik v. Landstar Express American Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Express American Inc
Represented By: Erik Duenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles David Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazamud Din Malik
Represented By: Jordan Alan Widner Barkey
Represented By: Hunter C. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?