Hall et al v. Meisner et al
Plaintiff: Kristina Govan, Carolyn Miller, Marcus Byers, American Internet Group LLC, Coretha Lee, Tawanda Hall, Anthony Akande and Curtis Lee
Defendant: Andrew Meisner, Kenson Siver, Oakland County, E'Toile Libbett, Frederick Zorn, Southfield Non-Profit Housing Corporation, Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy, Mitchell Simon, Susan Ward -Witkowski, Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC, Irvin Lowenberg, City of Southfield, Michigan and Gerald Witkowski
Case Number: 2:2020cv12230
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 11/6/2020) - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (LBar)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for all parties to Show Cause why Case Nos. 19-10047 and 20-12230, should not be consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a).. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT, HABITAT FOR HUMANITY TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT ; ( Response due by 10/28/2020) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer appearing on behalf of Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE Notice Pursuant to Mich. R. Pro. Conduct 1.10(B)(2) by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Scott)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Internet Group LLC (Smith, Scott)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy (McGregor, Gayle)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Sweet McGregor on behalf of Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy. (McGregor, Gayle)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF AMERICAN INTERNET GROUP, LLC TO DISCLOSE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS Response due by 10/23/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland to District Judge Paul D. Borman. (ATee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Fleming on behalf of Andrew Meisner, Oakland County. (Fleming, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Horton on behalf of Andrew Meisner, Oakland County. (Horton, William)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Couvreur on behalf of E'Toile Libbett, Mitchell Simon, Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC, Southfield Non-Profit Housing Corporation. (Couvreur, Joseph)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Nicols on behalf of E'Toile Libbett, Mitchell Simon, Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC, Southfield Non-Profit Housing Corporation. (Nicols, Matthew)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by City of Southfield, Michigan, Irvin Lowenberg, Kenson Siver, Susan Ward -Witkowski, Gerald Witkowski, Frederick Zorn Notice Pursuant to Mich. R. Pro. Conduct 1.10(B)(2) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Knoblock, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Andrew Meisner served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Smith, Scott)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oakland County served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Smith, Scott)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Southfield, Michigan served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Smith, Scott)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of City of Southfield, Michigan, Irvin Lowenberg, Kenson Siver, Susan Ward -Witkowski, Gerald Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Seward, T.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Knoblock on behalf of City of Southfield, Michigan, Irvin Lowenberg, Kenson Siver, Susan Ward -Witkowski, Gerald Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Knoblock, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
August 20, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 [DOCUMENT IS NOT AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; IT'S A CIVIL COVER SHEET] AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Smith, Scott) ).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Andrew Meisner, Oakland County, Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC, City of Southfield, Michigan, Frederick Zorn, Kenson Siver, Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy, Susan Ward -Witkowski, Gerald Witkowski, Irvin Lowenberg, Mitchell Simon, E'Toile Libbett, Southfield Non-Profit Housing Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7994981 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Smith, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Meisner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Govan
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Miller
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Byers
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Internet Group LLC
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretha Lee
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanda Hall
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Akande
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Meisner
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: John R. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenson Siver
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: John R. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E'Toile Libbett
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Zorn
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Non-Profit Housing Corporation
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habitat of Humanity for Oakland County Incountyy
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Represented By: Gayle Sweet McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Simon
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ward -Witkowski
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin Lowenberg
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Southfield, Michigan
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Witkowski
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?