Walker v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Annie Walker
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 - 100
Case Number: 2:2020cv12232
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Dismissing Defendant McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Dismiss co-defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to FRCP 21 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Mitchell on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Mitchell, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Taylor Tapley Daly appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Daly, Taylor)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sanjay Ghosh appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Northern District of Texas. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 Docket Sheet from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02187.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Joseph Abell's case be severed and transferred to the Baltimore Division of the District of Maryland (Civil case 3:20-cv-2182 opened); b. Plaintiff Michael Bell's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2183 opened); c. Plaintiff Scott German's case be severed and transferred to the Toledo Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2184 opened); d. Plaintiff Marie Leonard's case be severed and transferred to the Raleigh Division of the Eastern District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2185 opened); e. Plaintiff Wilhemenia Lindsey's case be severed and transferred to the Columbus Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2186 opened); f. Plaintiff Annie Walker's case be severed and transferred to the Ann Arbor Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2187 opened); g. Plaintiff Loreta Windmyer's case be severed and transferred to the Dayton Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2188 opened); h. Plaintiff Cathy Wilburn's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2189 opened); i. Plaintiff Cynthia Hughes's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2190 opened). Plaintiff Manuela Gonzalez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Does 1 through 100 inclusive, C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896016) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, Inc., #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02187.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Walker
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?