Slocum v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Slocum
Defendant: Does 1 - 100, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12242
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 10/20/2020 is Cancelled. Scheduling Conference will be reset after 90 days if case has not settled. (BSau)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Stay Deadlines and Adjourning Scheduling Conference Without Date. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Zoom Connection Information will be sent to parties prior to the hearing. ***JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN DUE BY 10/13/2020*** (BSau)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss co-defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to FRCP 21 filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss co-defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to FRCP 21 by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Mitchell on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Mitchell, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Taylor Tapley Daly appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc (Daly, Taylor)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sanjay Ghosh appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Northern District of Texas. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02234.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER 22 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Kawanda Coleman's case be severed and transferred to the Baton Rouge Division of the Middle District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2227-S); b. Plaintiff Deborah Gaylor's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2228-S); c. Plaintiff Gary Gross's case be severed and transferred to the Jefferson City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2229-S); d. Plaintiff Teresa Kearney's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2230-S); e. Plaintiff Gary Long's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2231-S); f. Plaintiff Lecia Moore's case be severed and transferred to the Hartford Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2232-S); g. Plaintiff Katherine Ringle's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2233-S); h. Plaintiff Margaret Slocum's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2234-S); i. Plaintiff Jeff Waller's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2235-S). Plaintiff Amanda Kozma is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900563) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued- Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02234.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slocum v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Slocum
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?