Gjergjaj v. Cuccinelli et al
Petitioner: Valdete Gjergjaj
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Supervisory ISO Lisa Jones, MICHAEL KLINGER, Christopher Wray and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv12244
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,, filed by Valdete Gjergjaj. Response due by 12/11/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zak Toomey on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Lisa Jones, MICHAEL KLINGER, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray. (Toomey, Zak)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Office of the Attorney General served on 08/27/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Attorney served on 08/25/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (NAhm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chad Wolf served on 08/19/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Supervisory ISO Lisa Jones served on 08/19/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 08/19/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Christopher Wray served on 08/19/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Klinger served on 08/19/2020. (Pastor, Caridad)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Kenneth Cuccinelli, Lisa Jones, MICHAEL KLINGER, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray* (DWor)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Valdete Gjergjaj against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Lisa Jones, MICHAEL KLINGER, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7996346 - Fee: 400 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Pastor, Caridad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gjergjaj v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Supervisory ISO Lisa Jones
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL KLINGER
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valdete Gjergjaj
Represented By: Caridad Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?