Ostrander v. Connelly Skis, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ostrander
Defendant: Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC and Connelly Skis, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12405
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Deegan on behalf of Connelly Skis, Inc.. (Deegan, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jesse Louis Roth appearing on behalf of Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC (Roth, Jesse)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard M. Mitchell appearing on behalf of Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC (Mitchell, Richard)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANTS 90 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Connelly Skis, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Mueller, Wolf)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Mueller, Wolf)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC* (LGra)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Connelly Skis, Inc.* (LGra)
September 3, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Nicholas Ostrander against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8025611 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Ingham - County of 1st Defendant: Lynnwood, WA. [Previously dismissed case: USDC WD MI, 20-00798, Judge Robert Jonker] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mueller, Wolf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostrander v. Connelly Skis, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ostrander
Represented By: Wolf Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fogarty's Lake Flower Marina, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Mitchell
Represented By: Jesse Louis Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connelly Skis, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Deegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?