Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab et al
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Naim Khanafer, D.C., Hussein Huraibi, M.D., Mohamad Kazan, Straightway Transportation LLC, Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab, Hussein A. Huraibi, MD, PLLC d/b/a Huraibi Pain & Rehab Institute, Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C., Naiel Salameh, D.C., HS Management LLC, Kallil Kazan, D.C. and Core Health PLLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv12407
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Straightway Transportation LLC served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mohamad Kazan served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab, Core Health PLLC, Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C., Kallil Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C., Naiel Salameh, D.C.. (Joelson, Peter)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab, Core Health PLLC, Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C., Kallil Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C., Naiel Salameh, D.C. (Blumberg, Gary)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Naim Khanafer, D.C. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Naiel Salameh, D.C. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kallil Kazan, D.C. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Core Health PLLC waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab waiver sent on 8/8/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) Modified on 9/9/2020 (SKra).[WRONG SENT DATE ENTERED-SENT ON 9/8/2020, ANSWER DUE ON 11/9/2020]
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
September 4, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Esurance Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Tertan on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tertan, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn McEttrick on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab, Core Health PLLC, Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C., HS Management LLC, Hussein Huraibi, M.D., Hussein A. Huraibi, MD, PLLC d/b/a Huraibi Pain & Rehab Institute, Mohamad Kazan, Kallil Kazan, D.C., Naim Khanafer, D.C., Naiel Salameh, D.C., Straightway Transportation LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8025627 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Applied Rehab Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #3 Exhibit 2 - Elite Chiropractic Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #4 Exhibit 3 - Core Health Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #5 Exhibit 4 - Straightway Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #6 Exhibit 5 - Huraibi Pain & Rehab Institute Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #7 Exhibit 6 - HS Management Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #8 Exhibit 7 - Mail and Wire Fraud Chart, #9 Exhibit 8 - Applied Rehab Damages Chart, #10 Exhibit 9 - Elite Chiropractic Damages Chart, #11 Exhibit 10 - Core Health Damages Chart, #12 Exhibit 11 - Straightway Damages Chart, #13 Exhibit 12 - Huraibi Pain & Rehab Institute Damages Chart, #14 Exhibit 13 - HS Management Damages Chart, #15 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naim Khanafer, D.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussein Huraibi, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad Kazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straightway Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Rehab & Physical Therapy LLC d/b/a Applied Rehab
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussein A. Huraibi, MD, PLLC d/b/a Huraibi Pain & Rehab Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Chiropractic Center, P.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naiel Salameh, D.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallil Kazan, D.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Health PLLC
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?