United States of America v. $99,670 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $99,670 in U.S. Currency, 2012 Porsche Panamera, VIN WP0AA2A74CL014639, 2013 Ford F150, VIN 1FTFW1ET8DKE49809 and 2007 BMW 650i, VIN WBAEK13557CN84351
Case Number: 2:2020cv12453
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #5 Warrant Issued, #9 Amended Complaint, #3 Warrant Issued, #6 Warrant Issued by United States of America (El-Zein, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (El-Zein, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #5 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, #6 Warrant Issued by United States of America (El-Zein, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 20-cr-20029, Judge Denise Page Hood] (El-Zein, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $99,670 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $99,670 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Porsche Panamera, VIN WP0AA2A74CL014639
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Ford F150, VIN 1FTFW1ET8DKE49809
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 BMW 650i, VIN WBAEK13557CN84351
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael El-Zein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?