Impact Force, Inc. v. Graves
Plaintiff: Impact Force, Inc
Defendant: John Graves
Case Number: 2:2020cv12458
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Status Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu)
October 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hermon, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Frailey on behalf of Impact Force, Inc. (Frailey, Andrea)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey A. Goldwater appearing on behalf of John Graves (Goldwater, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Impact Force, Inc. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Bracke, Michelle)
September 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 9, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Michelle M. Bracke re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Bracke on behalf of John Graves. (Bracke, Michelle)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT A re #1 Notice of Removal, by John Graves (Bracke, Michelle)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by John Graves re #1 Notice of Removal, and Civil Cover Sheet (Bracke, Michelle)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Graves from Wayne County, MI, case number 20-009494-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8033595 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bracke, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impact Force, Inc. v. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Graves
Represented By: Michelle M. Bracke
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Goldwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impact Force, Inc
Represented By: Andrea M. Frailey
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?