Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marcus Clay Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv12488
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Marcus Clay Smith served on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Versical, Bethany)
October 15, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr pursuant to Administrative Order 20-AO-049. (SSch)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Tucker on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Tucker, Jessica)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (KCas)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (SOso)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Marcus Clay Smith. (Versical, Bethany)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Clay Smith against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Versical, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jessica Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Clay Smith
Represented By: Bethany G. Versical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?