Kubik
Appellant: Tron It Consulting, Inc. and Aaron Trumley
Appellee: Geoffrey Kubik
Case Number: 2:2020cv12511
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Appellant Brief due by 11/30/2020, Appellee Brief due by 12/28/2020 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
October 15, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Tron It Consulting, Inc., Aaron Trumley, Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30353. This transmittal does not include the Bankruptcy Case Cover Sheet and the fee was not paid. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kubik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tron It Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron Trumley
Represented By: Christopher R. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Geoffrey Kubik
Represented By: Peter T. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?