Red Fit, LLC et al v. Red Effect International Franchise, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cali Red, LLC and Red Fit, LLC
Defendant: Red Effect LA County, LLC, Allie Mallad, Red Effect Orange County, LLC, Red Effect Holdings, LLC, Robert Vendittelli, Red Effect International Franchise, LLC, Erica Mallad, Carlos Guzman and Chelsie Bender
Case Number: 2:2020cv12513
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Red Effect Holdings, LLC (Fuhs, Bernard)
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Red Effect International Franchise, LLC (Fuhs, Bernard)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Red Effect LA County, LLC (Fuhs, Bernard)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Red Effect Orange County, LLC (Fuhs, Bernard)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION for Partial Dismissal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Assignment from Red Fit, LLC to Cali Red, LLC, #3 Exhibit B. Demonstrative: Table of Agreements, #4 Exhibit C. San Diego ADA, #5 Exhibit D. Assignment of Rights to Red Fit, LLC, #6 Exhibit E. Illinois Termination and Release Agreement, #7 Exhibit F. LA County ADA Repurchase Agreement, #8 Exhibit G. Orange County ADA Repurchase Agreement, #9 Exhibit H. Orange County Termination and Release Agreement, #10 Exhibit I. LA County Termination and Release Agreement, #11 Exhibit J. July 10, 2020 Notice of Default, #12 Exhibit K. July 27, 2020 Notices of Termination, #13 Exhibit L. Unpublished Cases) (Fuhs, Bernard)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Siljander, Briar)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Vendittelli served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Siljander, Briar)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Red Effect Orange County, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Siljander, Briar)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Red Effect LA County, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Siljander, Briar)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Red Effect International Franchise, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Siljander, Briar)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Red Effect Holdings, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Siljander, Briar)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/29/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah E. Treppa on behalf of All Defendants. (Treppa, Hannah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J. Fuhs on behalf of All Defendants. (Fuhs, Bernard)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 15, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Red Fit, LLC (Siljander, Briar)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Cali Red, LLC (Siljander, Briar)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8043659 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: California - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Arbitration Demand) (Siljander, Briar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Fit, LLC et al v. Red Effect International Franchise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Effect LA County, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allie Mallad
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Effect Orange County, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Effect Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vendittelli
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Effect International Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Mallad
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Guzman
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsie Bender
Represented By: Hannah E. Treppa
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cali Red, LLC
Represented By: Briar Siljander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Fit, LLC
Represented By: Briar Siljander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?