Lowman v. General Motors Corporation
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lowman
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Interested Party: Jerard M. Scanland
Case Number: 2:2020cv12515
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation, Denying #52 Motion for Sanctions - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re #50 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Kenneth Lowman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
August 26, 2022 Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman filed by Jerard M. Scanland Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
August 26, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman filed by Jerard M. Scanland, #60 Order on Kenneth Lowman at kenlow77@yahoo.com (EBut)
August 25, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2022 re #50 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Kenneth Lowman, #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman filed by Jerard M. Scanland Disposition: #50 granted, #52 denied (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (EBut)
August 2, 2022 Filing 58 RENOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #50 MOTION to Reopen Case, #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2022 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612680467?pwd=cW8xcVFwWkp1eFR5SFpBK0dUMkpZdz09 Passcode: 061946| (EBut)
August 2, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 10/5/22 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Grand is Cancelled. (EBut)
August 2, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #58 Notice of Hearing on Motion, on Kenneth Lowman at kenlow77@yahoo.com (EBut)
August 1, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #50 MOTION to Reopen Case, #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612680467?pwd=cW8xcVFwWkp1eFR5SFpBK0dUMkpZdz09 Passcode: 061946| (EBut)
July 20, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #54 Response to Motion filed by General Motors Corporation by Jerard M. Scanland (Scanland, Jerard)
July 18, 2022 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #52 Motion for sanctions filed by Kenneth Lowman. (document titled as a motion) (DPer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #50 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
July 7, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION for Sanctions Against Kenneth Lowman by Jerard M. Scanland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Motion To Discharge Lien) (Scanland, Jerard)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #50 MOTION to Reopen Case - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
July 6, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #51 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge on Kenneth Lowman at 19600 W. McNichols, Detroit, MI 48219. (LBar)
June 30, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION to reopen case and remove charging lien by Kenneth Lowman. (TTho)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
June 3, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE by General Motors Corporation re #43 MOTION to Reopen Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion to Reopen Matter and Enforce Lien) (Bengs, Tina)
May 31, 2022 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christin E. Russell) (Number of Pages: 34) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 6/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Russell, C.)
May 20, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2022 re #43 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Jerard M. Scanland Disposition: Hearing held on attorney Scanland's motion to re-open the case and enforce lien. (ECF No. 43). Within 14 days, General Motors shall submit to the Court a proposed order for resolving the motion, and Mr. Lowman shall have 7 days thereafter to submit any objections to the proposed order. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (EBut)
April 12, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #43 MOTION to Reopen Case . Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611782311?pwd=TjNSakordW1CSGJyUVNzQmJLVDRlQT09 Passcode: 881864| (EBut)
April 12, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #46 Notice of Hearing on Motion, on Kenneth Lowman at kenlow77@yahoo.com (EBut)
April 11, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Status Conference held on 4/11/2022.Disposition: The Court held a status conference by Zoom on April 11, 2022, to discuss the motion to reopen the case filed by Plaintiff's former counsel (ECF No. 43). The Court will schedule a formal hearing by Zoom on that motion, but it encouraged the parties to make a good faith effort to resolve the matter in the interim. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EBut)
April 7, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 4/11/2022 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1608683683?pwd=ZnphL0dDK25lYUl1cE90RTluQURTZz09 Passcode: 251723| (EBut)
April 7, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #45 Notice to Appear, on Kenneth Lowman at kenlow77@yahoo.com (EBut)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #43 MOTION to Reopen Case - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
March 11, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Reopen Case by Jerard M. Scanland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Lien, #2 Exhibit Report And Recommendation, #3 Exhibit Court Order Adopting Recommendation, #4 Exhibit Email, #5 Exhibit Retainer Agreement) (Scanland, Jerard)
December 27, 2021 Filing 42 JUDGMENT Dismissing Case with Prejudice Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LWag)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's Objections, Accepts and Adopts #38 Report and Recommendation, Denying #24 Motion to Reinstate Case and Oppose Settlement filed by Kenneth Lowman and Granting #13 Motion to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LWag)
December 15, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #39 Response (Free) Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Grand's Report and Recommendation by General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
December 2, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #38 Report and Recommendation by Kenneth Lowman. (DPer)
November 19, 2021 Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement filed by Kenneth Lowman, #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
September 1, 2021 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2021. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeseca C. Eddington) (Number of Pages: 28) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 9/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Eddington, J)
August 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2021 re #24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement filed by Kenneth Lowman, #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation. Disposition: Hearing held. Order to follow. In the meantime, the parties shall meet and confer as directed by the Court at the hearing. (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (EBut)
August 10, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement , #24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Join from a PC, Mac, iPad, iPhone or Android device: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603786503?pwd=SE1US2RIVTJUVnZEdWcwS2JnNGxNUT09 Passcode: 817808 Description: 20-12515 LOWMAN VS. GM (hearing on #13, #24) Or One tap mobile: +16692545252,,1603786503# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1603786503# US (New York) Or join by phone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 669 216 1590 or +1 551 285 1373 Webinar ID: 160 378 6503 International numbers available: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aczSjXTmDo Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Webinar ID: 160 378 6503 Passcode: 817808 SIP: 1603786503@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 817808| (EBut)
August 10, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #36 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,,, on Kenneth Lowman at kenlow77@yahoo.com (EBut)
July 19, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #35 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, on Kenneth Lowman at 19600 W. MCNICHOLS, DETROIT, MI 48219. (EBut)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #16 , #21 Motions to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (DPer)
July 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2021 re #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation, #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Kenneth Lowman (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (EBut)
July 14, 2021 Filing 34 RENOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement , #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney . Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Join from a PC, Mac, iPad, iPhone or Android device: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615897891?pwd=TU9odFpwaGh1OFN6MDlsUW5tWm9pdz09 Passcode: 101317 Description: 20-12515 Lowman Vs. GM (hearing on #13 & #16) Or One tap mobile: +16692545252,,1615897891# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1615897891# US (New York) Or join by phone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 669 216 1590 or +1 551 285 1373 Webinar ID: 161 589 7891 International numbers available: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aceBZk2WI2 Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Webinar ID: 161 589 7891 Passcode: 101317 SIP: 1615897891@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 101317| (EBut)
July 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing not held on 7/13/2021 re #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation, #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Kenneth Lowman (EBut)
July 13, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 7/13/21 at 10:00a.m. before Magistrate Judge is Cancelled. (EBut)
July 7, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
July 7, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response re #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
July 6, 2021 Filing 31 Corrected as to date Version of #30 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (Russell, C.)
July 6, 2021 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on 4/9/2021. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christin E. Russell) (Number of Pages: 12) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Russell, C.)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
July 1, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement by General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement, and #21 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by Kenneth Lowman. (Scanland, Jerard)
June 24, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Reinstate Case and Opposing Settlement, by Kenneth Lowman. (RLou)
June 24, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth Lowman (RLou)
June 22, 2021 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #21 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney, #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Kenneth Lowman. (Scanland, Jerard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for counsel to withdraw by Kenneth Lowman. (DPer)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement , #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney . Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Join from a PC, Mac, iPad, iPhone or Android device: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615897891?pwd=TU9odFpwaGh1OFN6MDlsUW5tWm9pdz09 Passcode: 101317 Description: 20-12515 Lowman Vs. GM (hearing on #13 & #16) Or One tap mobile: +16692545252,,1615897891# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1615897891# US (New York) Or join by phone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 669 216 1590 or +1 551 285 1373 Webinar ID: 161 589 7891 International numbers available: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aceBZk2WI2 Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Webinar ID: 161 589 7891 Passcode: 101317 SIP: 1615897891@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 101317| (EBut)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Requiring Response to #13 Motion,. Response due by 6/25/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kenneth Lowman Amended Notice Of Charging Lien (Scanland, Jerard)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney by Kenneth Lowman. (Scanland, Jerard)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Kenneth Lowman Notice Of Charging Lien (Scanland, Jerard)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Enforce Settlement by General Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tina M. Bengs, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit B, Signed Application for MSR, #5 Exhibit C, Settlement Agreement with Exhibit, #6 Exhibit D, Email dated 4/1/2021, #7 Exhibit E, Email dated 4/19/2021 with attachments) (Bengs, Tina)
April 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Settlement Conference held on 4/9/2021. Disposition: Case settled, stipulated order of dismissal due within 30 days. (EBut)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
March 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Settlement Conference held on 3/26/2021. Disposition: Settlement conference held on March 26, 2021. The parties agreed that their settlement discussions would benefit from a two-week adjournment so that they can exchange additional paperwork and information. The parties and their counsel shall work in good faith to exchange and discuss same. In the event the parties are unable to reach a resolution of this case on their own, the Court will hold an additional settlement conference on April 9, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (EBut)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/26/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
March 5, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Settlement Conference on 3/5/21 at 1:00p.m. before Magistrate Judge Grand is Cancelled. Notice to be issued for 3/26/21 at 1:00p.m. (EBut)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Settlement Conference - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
February 17, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/17/2021 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LBar)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 2/17/2021 @ 10:30 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by General Motors Corporation of Settlement (Bengs, Tina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kenneth Lowman against General Motors Corporation. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Scanland, Jerard)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal (COMPLAINT) (Responsive Pleading due by 10/27/2020) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal (COMPLAINT), (Responsive Pleading due by 10/13/2020) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 15, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Marie Bengs on behalf of General Motors Corporation. (Bengs, Tina)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors Corporation from 3rd Judicial Circuit Court of Wayne County, case number 20-009227-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8043861 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bengs, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowman v. General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lowman
Represented By: Scott P. Mussin
Represented By: Jerard M. Scanland
Represented By: Scott Patrick Mussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Represented By: Tina Marie Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jerard M. Scanland
Represented By: Jerard M. Scanland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?