National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Sredich et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Michael Dolan, Kathryn Dolan, Kimberly Sredich, Kathryn Doolan, David Sredich and Michael Doolan
Case Number: 2:2020cv12531
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Dolan served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Teicher, Julie)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Alternate Service and Brief in Support of Motion by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Teicher, Julie)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT as to Kimberly Sredich (LGra)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT as to Kathryn Dolan (LGra)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to Kimberly Sredich in the amount of $ 383,777.75 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lipman, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to Kathryn Dolan in the amount of $ 383,777.75 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lipman, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Kimberly Sredich* (LGra)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Kathryn Dolan* (LGra)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kimberly Sredich by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lipman, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kathryn Dolan by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lipman, Matthew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Lipman on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lipman, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kimberly Sredich served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Teicher, Julie)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kathryn Dolan served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Teicher, Julie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 16, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Julie B. Teicher appearing on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Teicher, Julie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Eisenberg, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8047862 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eisenberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Sredich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sredich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Doolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sredich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Doolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Julie B. Teicher
Represented By: David M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Matthew A. Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?