Quicken Loans, LLC v. ProBalance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans, LLC
Defendant: ProBalance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12595
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Quicken Loans, LLC (Gabel, Louis)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Louis P. Gabel on behalf of Quicken Loans, LLC to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Joseph on behalf of Quicken Loans, LLC. (Joseph, James)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *ProBalance, Inc.* (LGra)
September 23, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Quicken Loans, LLC identifying Other Affiliate RKT Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Rocket Companies, Inc. for Quicken Loans, LLC. (Gabel, Louis)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Quicken Loans, LLC against ProBalance, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8059810 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Pinellas County, FL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gabel, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quicken Loans, LLC v. ProBalance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProBalance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans, LLC
Represented By: Louis P. Gabel
Represented By: James P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?