Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan
Defendant: Kenneth S. Booth, Brett A. Roberts and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv12698
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Kalas appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kalas, William)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis A. Lienhardt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lienhardt, Dennis)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Striking #10 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION Regarding Defendants Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Kenneth S. Booth, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Brett A. Roberts (Knapp, Scott) Modified on 11/9/2020 (RLou).
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kenneth S. Booth waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Credit Acceptance Corporation waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brett A. Roberts waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Knapp on behalf of Kenneth S. Booth, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Brett A. Roberts. (Knapp, Scott)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. McNeill on behalf of Kenneth S. Booth, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Brett A. Roberts. (McNeill, Thomas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
October 5, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 - Certification and Schedule A re #1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Miller, E.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan against Kenneth S. Booth, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Brett A. Roberts with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8085619 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S. Booth
Represented By: Thomas G. McNeill
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett A. Roberts
Represented By: Thomas G. McNeill
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas G. McNeill
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Tran, Inc. Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1577 Pension Plan
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?