Wilson v. Fleck et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Wilson
Defendant: Melvin J. Fleck, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground, Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv12874
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
December 8, 2020 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melvin J. Fleck (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO GEICO INDEMINITY INSURANCE COMPANY for Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Melvin J. Fleck. (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground. (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. (Plagens, Kevin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc.. (Plagens, Kevin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Progressive Marathon Insurance Company (Cannatella, Tara)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Progressive Marathon Insurance Company. (Cannatella, Tara)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Progressive Marathon Insurance Company to Answer Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, ( Response due by 12/7/2020) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tara S. Cannatella appearing on behalf of Progressive Marathon Insurance Company (Cannatella, Tara)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael)
November 15, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geico Indemnity Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Progressive Marathon Insurance Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Marvin, Ronald)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melvin J. Fleck served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Disclosure/witness list WITNESS LIST by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
October 29, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zachary Wilson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8131521 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lapeer - County Where Action Arose: out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Lucas. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Marvin, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Fleck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin J. Fleck
Represented By: Kevin J. Plagens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Marathon Insurance Company
Represented By: Tara S. Cannatella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground
Represented By: Kevin J. Plagens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Plagens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael T. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Wilson
Represented By: Ronald S. Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?