Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC et al
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Vinod Sharma, M.D., Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC, Fouad Baydoun, Nabil Beydoun, Crown Procedure Center LLC, Midwest Medical Lab LLC, Galaxie Diagnostics LLC, Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC, Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC, Allan Schwartz, D.O., Four Star Center LLC, Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus, Riad Khoury, M.D., Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C. and Randy C. Rodnick
Case Number: 2:2020cv12879
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service by Vinod Sharma, M.D.. (Rodnick, Randy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy C. Rodnick on behalf of Vinod Sharma, M.D., Randy C. Rodnick. (Rodnick, Randy)
December 16, 2020 Filing 44 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midwest Medical Lab LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 16, 2020 Filing 43 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 16, 2020 Filing 42 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Galaxie Diagnostics LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 16, 2020 Filing 41 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Nabil Beydoun. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Midwest Medical Lab LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Fouad Baydoun. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Dewnya A. Bazzi on behalf of Galaxie Diagnostics LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Midwest Medical Lab LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Fouad Baydoun. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Nabil Beydoun. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Galaxie Diagnostics LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC. (Bazzi, Dewnya)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Fouad Baydoun waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 2, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC served on 11/8/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 2, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC served on 11/8/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 2, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Galaxie Diagnostics LLC served on 11/8/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vinod Sharma, M.D. served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midwest Medical Lab LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Riad Khoury, M.D. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nabil Beydoun served on 11/8/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of Recusal and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III to District Judge Sean F. Cox. (NAhm)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC, Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus, Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C., Crown Procedure Center LLC, Four Star Center LLC, Allan Schwartz, D.O.. (Joelson, Peter)
November 11, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 11, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Allan Schwartz, D.O. waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC, Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus, Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C., Crown Procedure Center LLC, Four Star Center LLC, Allan Schwartz, D.O. (Blumberg, Gary)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Four Star Center LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Crown Procedure Center LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C. waiver sent on 11/8/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Esurance Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Tertan on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tertan, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn McEttrick on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC, Fouad Baydoun, Nabil Beydoun, Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus, Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC, Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C., Crown Procedure Center LLC, Four Star Center LLC, Galaxie Diagnostics LLC, Riad Khoury, M.D., Midwest Medical Lab LLC, Allan Schwartz, D.O., Vinod Sharma, M.D., Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8132531 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Star Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment, #3 Exhibit 2 - Comprehensive Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment, #4 Exhibit 3 - CHICM Chart of Patients and Treatment, #5 Exhibit 4 - Crown Procedure Chart of Patients and Treatment, #6 Exhibit 5 - Galaxie Chart of Patients and Treatment, #7 Exhibit 6 - Midwest Chart of Patients and Treatment, #8 Exhibit 7 - Allan Schwartz Medical Center Chart of Patients and Treatment, #9 Exhibit 8 - Four Star Center Chart of Patients and Treatment, #10 Exhibit 9 - Email from Ohio Dept. of Health Regarding Midwests Lack of Certification, #11 Exhibit 10 - Mail Fraud Chart, #12 Exhibit 11 - Star Pain Damages Chart, #13 Exhibit 12 - Comprehensive Pain Damages Chart, #14 Exhibit 13 - CHICM Damages Chart, #15 Exhibit 14 - Crown Procedure Damages Chart, #16 Exhibit 15 - Galaxie Damages Chart, #17 Exhibit 16 - Midwest Damages Chart, #18 Exhibit 17 - Allan Schwartz Medical Center Damages Chart, #19 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #20 Proposed Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinod Sharma, M.D.
Represented By: Randy C. Rodnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Schwartz Medical Center PC
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fouad Baydoun
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil Beydoun
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Procedure Center LLC
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Medical Lab LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxie Diagnostics LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Health Institute Center of Michigan LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Pain Management & Rehab LLC
Represented By: Dewnya A. Bazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Schwartz, D.O.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Star Center LLC
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muna Afan a/k/a Muna Butrus
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riad Khoury, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Care Pain Management, P.C.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy C. Rodnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?