VCST Industrial Products BV et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: VCST Industrial Products BV and VCST De Mexico S DE RL DE CV
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv12919
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant General Motors LLC to Respond to Complaint. Response due by January 25, 2021. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant General Motors LLC to Respond to Complaint. Response due by December 14, 2020, Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Brown on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Brown, Lisa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Gavrilovic on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Gavrilovic, Nina)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors, LLC served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Ellis, Nicholas)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by VCST De Mexico S DE RL DE CV (Ellis, Nicholas)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by VCST Industrial Products BV (Ellis, Nicholas)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors, LLC* (NAhm)
October 30, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by VCST Industrial Products BV, VCST De Mexico S DE RL DE CV against General Motors, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8136724 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ellis, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VCST Industrial Products BV et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Nina Gavrilovic
Represented By: Lisa A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VCST Industrial Products BV
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VCST De Mexico S DE RL DE CV
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?