National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa v. ELGA Credit Union
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ELGA Credit Union
3Rd Party Defendant: The Jewel of Grand Blanc, LLC and Mark Hopkins
Case Number: 2:2020cv13005
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Mark Hopkins, The Jewel of Grand Blanc, LLC* (LGra)
January 7, 2021 REQUEST for THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS for The Jewel of Grand Blanc, LLC. (Milton, Lisa)
January 7, 2021 REQUEST for THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS for Mark Hopkins. (Milton, Lisa)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction re #9 Stipulation and Order. (RLou)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT and Reliance on Jury Demand filed by ELGA Credit Union against Mark Hopkins, The Jewel of Grand Blanc, LLC (Milton, Lisa)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ELGA Credit Union (Milton, Lisa)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by ELGA Credit Union. (Milton, Lisa)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [DOCKETING ERROR - INCORRECT CASE] STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, ( Response due by 12/19/2020) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) Modified on 12/21/2020 (RLou). (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/21/2020) (RLou).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings (Responsive Pleading due by 12/18/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T. Milton on behalf of ELGA Credit Union. (Milton, Lisa)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ELGA Credit Union served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Teicher, Julie)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *ELGA Credit Union* (DAll)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Julie B. Teicher appearing on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa (Teicher, Julie)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Lipman, Matthew)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa against ELGA Credit Union. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8154096 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:20-cv-12503, Judge Judger Linda V. Parker] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Check, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - A&R) (Lipman, Matthew)
November 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa v. ELGA Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa
Represented By: Matthew A. Lipman
Represented By: Julie B. Teicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ELGA Credit Union
Represented By: Lisa T. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Jewel of Grand Blanc, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mark Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?