Beim v. Henry Ford Health System
Plaintiff: Inna Beim
Defendant: Henry Ford Health System
Case Number: 2:2020cv13054
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Altman : Settlement Conference to be scheduled within the 30-day period before the deadline for the Joint Final Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/5/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Discovery due by 7/9/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/9/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/27/2021 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Bench Trial set for 1/10/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Fowler, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Fowler on behalf of Inna Beim. (Fowler, Ryan)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2021 04:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith).Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Henry Ford Health System (Ross, Bert)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Henry Ford Health System. (Ross, Bert)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bert T. Ross appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Bert)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Henry Ford Health System served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Batey, Scott)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Henry Ford Health System* (SKra)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Inna Beim against Henry Ford Health System with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8167729 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Batey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beim v. Henry Ford Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inna Beim
Represented By: Scott P. Batey
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ford Health System
Represented By: Bert T. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?