State Line Construction and Maintenance LLC et al v. Detroit Public Lighting Authority et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Coger, Jr. and State Line Construction and Maintenance LLC
Defendant: Melvin Hollowell, Melvin Butch Hollowell, Rod Parker, Beau Taylor, Ric Preuss, Patrick Padgett, Dr. Lorna Thomas and Detroit Public Lighting Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv13063
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Melvin Hollowell, Detroit Public Lighting Authority, Patrick Padgett, Rod Parker, Ric Preuss, Beau Taylor, Lorna Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Oct Warning Letters, #3 Exhibit Additional Warning Letters, #4 Exhibit PLA Incident Report, #5 Exhibit Invoices, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Beau Tayor, #7 Exhibit Motion for Diversion Program, #8 Exhibit Unpublished Case) (Hunt, Monica)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 13). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 30, 2020 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Detroit Public Lighting Authority against Ernest Coger, Jr., State Line Construction and Maintenance LLC (Hunt, Monica)
December 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Beau Taylor. (Hunt, Monica)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Adams, Anthony)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibits 1-5, #2 Document Continuation Affidavit of Melanie Steele) (Adams, Anthony)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 9). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 7). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Adams, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Monifa K. Gray on behalf of All Defendants. (Gray, Monifa)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica N. Hunt on behalf of All Defendants. (Hunt, Monica)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 17, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Melvin Hollowell, Detroit Public Lighting Authority, Patrick Padgett, Rod Parker, Ric Preuss, Beau Taylor, Lorna Thomas* (SKra)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Paid-$400 Receipt # AMIEDC-8170059. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Adams, Anthony) Modified on 11/17/2020 (SKra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Line Construction and Maintenance LLC et al v. Detroit Public Lighting Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Hollowell
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Butch Hollowell
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Parker
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Taylor
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric Preuss
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Padgett
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lorna Thomas
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Public Lighting Authority
Represented By: Monifa K. Gray
Represented By: Monica N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Coger, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Line Construction and Maintenance LLC
Represented By: Anthony Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?