Pasha v. Grosse Pointe Public School System
Plaintiff: Arthur Pasha
Defendant: Grosse Pointe Public School System
Case Number: 2:2020cv13090
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grosse Pointe Public School System (McInerney, Mark)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Grosse Pointe Public School System. (McInerney, Mark)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Giroux on behalf of Arthur Pasha. (Giroux, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie Victoria Romeo appearing on behalf of Grosse Pointe Public School System (Romeo, Stephanie)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark W. McInerney appearing on behalf of Grosse Pointe Public School System (McInerney, Mark)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grosse Pointe Public School System served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Stempien, Eric)
November 20, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Grosse Pointe Public School System* (TTho)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arthur Pasha against Grosse Pointe Public School System with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8177553 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Stempien, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasha v. Grosse Pointe Public School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Pasha
Represented By: Eric Stempien
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grosse Pointe Public School System
Represented By: Stephanie Victoria Romeo
Represented By: Mark W. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?