Ontel Products Corporation v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Ontel Products Corporation
Defendant: John/Jane 1-10 Doe, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Applexa Ltd, Tech X Deal Ltd and Hyper SLS Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv13118
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery filed by Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Bedini Dec ISO Sur-Reply, #2 Xing Dec ISO Sur-Reply, #3 Yan Dec ISO Sur-Reply) (Eckerly, Ashley)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Applexa Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence) (Ryan, Christopher)
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Eckerly, Ashley)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Screen Captures, #4 Exhibit D - Arctic Air Design Patent Images, #5 Exhibit E - Arctic Air Ultra Design Patent Images, #6 Exhibit F - Comparison of Packaging) (Ryan, Christopher)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery filed by Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Novikov ISO Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Novikov, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Novikov, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Novikov, #6 Astoul Declaration ISO Opposition, #7 Xing Declaration ISO Opposition, #8 Yan Declaration ISO Opposition) (Eckerly, Ashley)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617355247?pwd=OU12ZVBCZjNpYWVTbThLdXkvT3JCUT09 Passcode: 927620 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617355247# or +16468287666,,1617355247#| (JMcC)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Applexa Ltd waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021; G Com PTE, Ltd waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021; Hyper SLS Ltd waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021; Hyper Z Tech Ltd waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021; Novads OU waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021; Tech X Deal Ltd waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Ryan, Christopher)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued for *Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd* (NAhm)
December 7, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Ryan, Christopher)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Briefing Schedule ( Response due by 12/11/2020, Reply due by 12/16/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (Sandusky, K)
December 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 12/3/2020. Disposition: Parties to Submit Stipulation resolving Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (JMcC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Artz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Artz, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION Motion for Permission to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery by Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Eckerly, Ashley)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley F. Eckerly on behalf of Applexa Ltd, G Com PTE, Ltd, Hyper SLS Ltd, Hyper Z Tech Ltd, Novads OU, Tech X Deal Ltd. (Eckerly, Ashley)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Ryan, Christopher)
November 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2020 re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery filed by Ontel Products Corporation. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Marie Metcalf) (JMcC)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603039929?pwd=R2p1cWQ5TDRLdXdPcWFFWHd4NG5VUT09 Passcode: 497090 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1603039929# or +16468287666,,1603039929#| (JMcC)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ontel Products Corporation (Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Immediate Discovery by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order) (Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ontel Products Corporation against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8183261 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 3, #2 Document Continuation A Part 2 of 3, #3 Document Continuation A Part 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I) (Ryan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontel Products Corporation v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane 1-10 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Com PTE, Ltd
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyper Z Tech Ltd
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novads OU
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applexa Ltd
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech X Deal Ltd
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyper SLS Ltd
Represented By: Ashley F. Eckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ontel Products Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Ryan
Represented By: John S. Artz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?