Healey (nee) Palmer v. Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C.
Plaintiff: Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer
Defendant: Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C., Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv13209
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Take Deposition from Adam Swaninger; unknown person who signed the Bill of Sale; Terese Delcollo; and Lawrence Drexler and, MOTION to Produce the Forward Flow Purchase Agreement (the Agreement) dated August 28, 2015 between Seller and Midland Funding LLC (Purchaser) pursuant to Rule 56(d) by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Email exchange between counsel, #3 Exhibit B. Declaration of Curtis C. Warner, #4 Exhibit C. Affidavit of Adam Swaninger, Dellarocca v. Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., 2:19-cv-02667-RRM-ARL, Doc. 15-11 (E.D.N.Y Feb. 3, 2020), #5 Exhibit D. Declaration of Adam Swaninger, Church v. Midland Funding, LLC, et al., 2:20-cv-10538-CCC-ESK (D.N.J. Sept. 18, 2020), #6 Exhibit E. LinkedIn profile for Terese Delcollo, screen shot, #7 Exhibit F. New York Certificate of Conformity Explanation, #8 Exhibit G. LinkedIn profile for Lawrence Drexler, screen shot) (Warner, Curtis)
January 27, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBIT List with Redacted Exhibits re #23 Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Adam Swaninger, #2 Exhibit 2. Healy Cardholder Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3. Healy Barclay Statements) (Dell, David)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Motion to File an Amended Complaint by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Amended Complaint and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 2. January 6, 2021 email to Defendants' counsel, #4 Exhibit 3. January 21-22, 2021 emails between counsel) (Warner, Curtis)
January 20, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Adam Swaninger Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2. Cardholder Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3. Account Statements) (Dell, David)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOLLOWING JANUARY 6, 2021 CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 6, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K)
December 30, 2020 Filing 21 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Warner, Curtis)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C. (Silverstein, Corey)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C.. (Silverstein, Corey)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midland Funding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding LLC. (Seitz, Theodore)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Seitz, Theodore)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT of LOCAL RULE CERTIFICATION, ECF Nos. 5 by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer (Evanchek, John)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of LOCAL RULE CERTIFICATION, ECF Nos. 2, 9 & 10 by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer (Warner, Curtis)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer re #8 Consent, #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Notice of Waiver of Remand (Warner, Curtis)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer re #8 Consent, #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Response Agreeing with Defendants' Basis for Jurisdiction and Venue Set Forth in the Notice of Removal (Warner, Curtis)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
December 7, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Seitz, Theodore)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S. Toll on behalf of Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C.. (Toll, Kevin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Evanchek on behalf of Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer. (Evanchek, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Warner, Curtis)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midland Funding LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Warner, Curtis)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis C. Warner on behalf of Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer. (Warner, Curtis)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-014367-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8203094 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Silverstein, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healey (nee) Palmer v. Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiana Healey (nee) Palmer
Represented By: Curtis C. Warner
Represented By: John Evanchek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane M. Elliot, P.C.
Represented By: Corey D. Silverstein
Represented By: Kevin S. Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Represented By: David M. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Represented By: David M. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?