Abraham v. American Resource Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew J Abraham
Defendant: American Resource Company LLC, Nourican Portfolio I LLC, Steven Gallegos, John Liatsis and Gary Ohlbaum
Case Number: 2:2020cv13250
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Matthew J Abraham. (Ebbott, Richard)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Matthew J Abraham to Show Cause why his case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew J Abraham against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8218048 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: GENESEE - County Where Action Arose: GENESEE - County of 1st Defendant: OUT OF STATE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Joint Venture and PS Agmt) (Ebbott, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham v. American Resource Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Resource Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nourican Portfolio I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liatsis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Ohlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J Abraham
Represented By: Richard H. Ebbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?