FCA U.S., L.L.C. v. Martinrea International US Inc et al
Plaintiff: FCA U.S., L.L.C.
Defendant: Martinrea International US Inc and Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV
Case Number: 2:2020cv13334
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: VIDEO Status Conference held on 2/3/2021. Disposition: Motions held in abeyance until after mediation. Parties will notify the court by 2/17/2021 regarding mediation. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Linkous on behalf of FCA U.S., L.L.C.. (Linkous, Derek)
January 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: VIDEO Status Conference held on 1/7/2021. Disposition: Parties encouraged to continue working towards a resolution. (VIDEO Status Conference set for 2/3/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman). (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur) **HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM VIDEO--THE COURT WILL EMAIL INSTRUCTIONS AND CONNECTION LINK SEPARATELY**
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/7/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605230952?pwd=ODBKSVdOVlpRRExLTi9BVHdYSXUxQT09 Passcode: 876175 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1605230952# or +16468287666,,1605230952#| (JCur)
December 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: VIDEO Motion Hearing held on 12/23/2020 Re: #1 Motion for TRO filed by Martinrea International US Inc, Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV. Disposition: Court encouraged parties to keep trying to resolve; VIDEO status conference set for 1/7/2021 at 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Andrea Wabeke) (JCur)
December 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: VIDEO Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2020 and continued to 12/23/2020 at 2:00 PM Re: #1 Motion for TRO filed by Martinrea International US Inc, Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV. Disposition: Hearing adjourned technical issues with video. (Court Reporter: Andrea Wabeke) (JCur)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Martinrea International US Inc served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Murray, Moheeb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 RE-NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #1 MOTION for TRO: Motion Hearing reset for 12/23/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. |Zoom Webinar Information: Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605230952?pwd=ODBKSVdOVlpRRExLTi9BVHdYSXUxQT09 Passcode: 876175 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1605230952# or +16468287666,,1605230952#| (JCur)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #1 MOTION for TRO Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605230952?pwd=ODBKSVdOVlpRRExLTi9BVHdYSXUxQT09 Passcode: 876175 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1605230952# or +16468287666,,1605230952#| (JCur)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Gomez on behalf of FCA U.S., L.L.C.. (Gomez, Luis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Moheeb H. Murray on behalf of FCA U.S., L.L.C.. (Murray, Moheeb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to FCA US's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Martinrea International US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - E. Lancaster Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - '294 PO, #4 Exhibit 3 - Terms & Conditions - Mexico, #5 Exhibit 4 - Terms & Conditions - Mexico (English Version), #6 Exhibit 5 - Letter from F. Richardson to T. Stander, June 10, 2019, #7 Exhibit 6 - Email between M. Heppler and T. Stander, March 24-26, 2020, #8 Exhibit 7 - '555 PO, #9 Exhibit 8a - Letter from Martinrea Mexico to FCA Mexico, July 2, 2020, #10 Exhibit 8b - Letter from Martinrea International to Martinrea Mexico, December 5, 2020, #11 Exhibit 9 - Letter from M. Horneck to P. D'Eramo, December 4, 2020, #12 Exhibit 10 - Letter from R. Fairchild to M. Horneck, December 11, 2020, #13 Exhibit 11 - Letter from M. Horneck to P. D'Eramo, December 11, 2020, #14 Exhibit 12 - '293 PO, excerpts, #15 Exhibit 13 - Complaint (without exhibits)) (Warner, Brent)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV, Martinrea International US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - '293 PO, #4 Exhibit 3 - '294 PO) (Warner, Brent) Modified on 12/22/2020 (TTho).[MARTINREA HONSEL MEXICO SA DE CV NOT REPRESENTED BY BRENT WARNER, ENTERED IN ERROR]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason D. Killips on behalf of Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV, Martinrea International US Inc. (Killips, Jason) Modified on 12/22/2020 (TTho). [MARTINREA HONSEL MEXICO SA DE CV NOT REPRESENTED BY JASON KILLIPS, ENTERED IN ERROR]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV, Martinrea International US Inc from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-185155-CB. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8230202 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit B - Motion for TRO, #4 Exhibit C - Order) (Warner, Brent) Modified on 12/22/2020 (TTho). [MARTINREA HONSEL MEXICO SA DE CV IS NOT REPRESENTED BY BRENT WARNER, ENTERED IN ERROR]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FCA U.S., L.L.C. v. Martinrea International US Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA U.S., L.L.C.
Represented By: Moheeb H. Murray
Represented By: Luis E. Gomez
Represented By: Derek J. Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinrea International US Inc
Represented By: Brent W. Warner
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinrea Honsel Mexico SA de CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?