Geico Indemnity Company v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant: James C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv10313
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 COPY of #11 Order mailed to James C. Johnson and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
April 2, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on James C. Johnson. Mailed to James C. Johnson at 11449 Rockland, Redford, MI 48239. (EKar)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James C. Johnson re #3 Order to Show Cause (SSch)
March 19, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order mailed to James C. Johnson at 12821 Souix, Redford, MI 48239. (BSau)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Defendant's Letter #9 and Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Judgment #10 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (BSau)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16) (Wright, James)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from James C. Johnson (DPer)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *James C. Johnson* (NAhm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James C. Johnson by Geico Indemnity Company. (Wright, James)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Geico Indemnity Company of Defendant new mailing address (Wright, James)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Response (ECF No. #5 ) the #3 Order to Show Cause is hereby SATISFIED. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Wright, James)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James C. Johnson served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Wright, James)
February 26, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order to Show Cause on James C. Johnson, 12821 Souix, Redford, MI 48239 (Sandusky, K)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Sandusky, K)
February 10, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *James C. Johnson* (DAll)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Geico Indemnity Company against James C. Johnson with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8327988 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bibb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 20-000801-NF, Judge Sheila Ann Gibson] (Wright, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Indemnity Company v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: James C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?