LOUCHART v. ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: JANICE LOUCHART
Defendant: ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2021cv10913
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE remanding case to GENESEE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Genesee County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (DPer)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Response to Order to Clarify Claims by JANICE LOUCHART (Kelly, Kevin)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Kelly on behalf of JANICE LOUCHART. (Kelly, Kevin)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany A. Buckley-Norwood on behalf of ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL. (Buckley-Norwood, Tiffany)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiff to Clarify Claims. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
April 23, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Edinger, Franceska)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 21-115403-CD. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8437281 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Edinger, Franceska)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOUCHART v. ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Franceska Edinger
Represented By: Tiffany A. Buckley-Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE LOUCHART
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?