Alhaji Sirleaf d/b/a Global Transportation v. Priority Express et al
Plaintiff: Alhaji Sirleaf d/b/a Global Transportation
Defendant: Fadil Sero and Priority Express
Case Number: 2:2021cv11127
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Answering Complaint filed by Priority Express, Fadil Sero. On June 7, 2021, this case was transferred to the Western District of Michigan (case no. 1:21-cv-00469) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Answering Complaint by Priority Express, Fadil Sero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Concurrence Email, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Police Report, #4 Exhibit D - Business Information Search) (Eads, John)
June 9, 2021 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Western District of Michigan as case 1:21-cv-00469, filed 06/08/2021. (VLun)
June 8, 2021 Case transferred to Western District of Michigan. (VLun)
June 7, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Alhaji Sirleaf d/b/a Global Transportation at 5444 Old US Hwy 78, Memphis, TN 38118 (LBar)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (DPer)
May 17, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fadil Sero, Priority Express from 57th District Court, case number 21-0280-GC. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8466453 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Eads, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alhaji Sirleaf d/b/a Global Transportation v. Priority Express et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadil Sero
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Express
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alhaji Sirleaf d/b/a Global Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?