Cooley, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Cooley, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv11190
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Olinsky, Howard)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (NAhm)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Houle on behalf of Bobby Gene Cooley, Jr.. (Houle, Joseph)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Bobby Gene Cooley, Jr.. (Olinsky, Howard)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bobby Gene Cooley, Jr. against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Shiawassee - County Where Action Arose: Shiawassee - County of 1st Defendant: Shiawassee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Olinsky, Howard)
May 21, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Cooley, Jr.
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Represented By: Joseph E. Houle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?