Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc. v. Partminer Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Partminer Industries, LLC, 313 Industries, Inc. and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv11592
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. 313 Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Asmus, Brittany)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, (Answer due by 11/16/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proposed Order) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Partminer Industries, LLC served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card/Return Receipt) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 313 Industries, Inc. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card/Return Receipt) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Office of the Attorney General served on 7/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Green Card/Return Receipt) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Department of Justice served on 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card/Return Receipt) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amy Contracting Command served on 7/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Green Card/Return Receipt) (Asmus, Brittany)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Asmus, Brittany)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DPer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (DPer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *313 Industries, Inc.* (DPer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Partminer Industries, LLC* (DPer)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8528702 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit TACOM Contract, #3 Exhibit NDA, #4 Exhibit Purchase Orders, #5 Exhibit Purchase Orders, #6 Exhibit Purchase Orders, #7 Exhibit Purchase Orders, #8 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit Shipping Labels) (Asmus, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc. v. Partminer Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warfighter FOCUSed Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany H. Asmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partminer Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 313 Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?