Bank of America, NA v. Nida Alshaikh DDS PC et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, NA
Defendant: Nida Alshaikh DDS PC, Larrn Investment LLC, Nida Alshaikh, U.S. Bank Equipment Finance and Citizens Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11812
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Answer to Complaint by U.S. Bank Equipment Finance (Summers, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by U.S. Bank Equipment Finance identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Equipment Finance. (Summers, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Bank Equipment Finance. (Summers, Kevin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Bank Equipment Finance served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Cronk, Peter)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Citizens Bank, N.A. (Zousmer, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Zousmer, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Citizens Bank, N.A. served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Cronk, Peter)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SSch)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/5/2021) (DPer).
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, NA identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation for Bank of America, NA. (Cronk, Peter)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bank of America, NA against Nida Alshaikh, Citizens Bank, N.A., Larrn Investment LLC, Nida Alshaikh DDS PC, U.S. Bank Equipment Finance. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8566324 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Cronk, Peter)
August 5, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, NA v. Nida Alshaikh DDS PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Peter D. Cronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nida Alshaikh DDS PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larrn Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nida Alshaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance
Represented By: Kevin N. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael I. Zousmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?