United States of America v. One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) U.S. Currency, Seventy-Seven Thousand One Hundred Fifty-Two Dollars ($77,152.00) U.S. Currency, Eight Thousand Two Hundred Ten Dollars ($8,210.00) U.S. Currency, Four Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Dollars ($4,390.00) U.S. Currency, Two Hundred Forty-Nine Thousand Eight Hundred Twenty Dollars ($249,820.00) U.S. Currency, One (1) Kimber PRO TLE II .45 Caliber Pistol Ser No: KR100106; 45 Caliber Magazine, Eight (8) Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition, One (1) Smith & Wesson 29 Limited .44 Caliber Revolver Ser No: CLJ0116, Six (6) Rounds of .44 Caliber Ammunition, One (1) North American Arms NAA .22 Caliber Revolver Ser No: E037077, Five (5) Rounds of .22 Caliber Ammunition, One (1) FNH Five Seven 5.7x28mm Pistol Ser No: 386346562; Two 5.7x28mm Magazines, Forty-Six (46) Rounds of 5.7x28mm Ammunition, One (1) Beretta 3032 Tomcat .32 Caliber Pistol Ser No: DAA209357; .32 Caliber Magazine, Seven (7) Rounds of .32 Caliber Ammunition, One (1) Kimber Ultra Carry II .45 Caliber Pistol Ser No: KU115914, One (1).45 Caliber Magazine, Seven (7) Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition, One (1) 14kt yellow gold nugget style bracelet, One (1)14kt yellow gold nugget design diamond ring set with 15 round brilliant cut diamonds, One (1) Rolex 218238 Day-Date 18K Yellow Gold Automatic Watch, One (1) 10k yellow gold stamped chain with cross pendant 149 round brilliant cut diamonds 21.00 carats and One (1) 10k yellow gold tested chain 714 round brilliant cut diamonds estimated 19.00 carats
Claimant: Jermaine Lett and Adrian Tabares-Ochoa
Case Number: 2:2021cv11829
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting substitution of attorney. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (TTho)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Jermaine Lett, Adrian Tabares-Ochoa. (Hall, Cyril)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 CLAIM of Interest in Seized Property by Adrian Tabares-Ochoa. (Hall, Cyril)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 CLAIM of Interest in Seized Property by Jermaine Lett. (Hall, Cyril)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 CLAIM Claim of Interest in Seized Property by Jermaine Lett. (Hall, Cyril)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cyril C. Hall on behalf of Adrian Tabares-Ochoa. (Hall, Cyril)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Jermaine Lett: Cyril C. Hall added. (Hall, Cyril)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven F. Fishman appearing on behalf of Jermaine Lett (Fishman, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Morris, Catherine)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (JOwe)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Morris, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventy-Seven Thousand One Hundred Fifty-Two Dollars ($77,152.00) U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Thousand Two Hundred Ten Dollars ($8,210.00) U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Dollars ($4,390.00) U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Hundred Forty-Nine Thousand Eight Hundred Twenty Dollars ($249,820.00) U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Kimber PRO TLE II .45 Caliber Pistol Ser No: KR100106; 45 Caliber Magazine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight (8) Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Smith & Wesson 29 Limited .44 Caliber Revolver Ser No: CLJ0116
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six (6) Rounds of .44 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) North American Arms NAA .22 Caliber Revolver Ser No: E037077
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five (5) Rounds of .22 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) FNH Five Seven 5.7x28mm Pistol Ser No: 386346562; Two 5.7x28mm Magazines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty-Six (46) Rounds of 5.7x28mm Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Beretta 3032 Tomcat .32 Caliber Pistol Ser No: DAA209357; .32 Caliber Magazine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven (7) Rounds of .32 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Kimber Ultra Carry II .45 Caliber Pistol Ser No: KU115914
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1).45 Caliber Magazine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven (7) Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 14kt yellow gold nugget style bracelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1)14kt yellow gold nugget design diamond ring set with 15 round brilliant cut diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Rolex 218238 Day-Date 18K Yellow Gold Automatic Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 10k yellow gold stamped chain with cross pendant 149 round brilliant cut diamonds 21.00 carats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 10k yellow gold tested chain 714 round brilliant cut diamonds estimated 19.00 carats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jermaine Lett
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adrian Tabares-Ochoa
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?